MA S2221 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2202
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - See S2202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - See S2202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | Senate | See S2202 |
Same As/Similar To
S2202 (Replaced by) 2017-11-09 - Reprinted as amended, see S2211
H2238 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H2240 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H2448 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H697 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H1925 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2238 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H2240 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H2448 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H697 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
H1925 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2221 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2221.pdf |