MA S2220 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2202

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - See S2202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transparency in Prescription Drug Formularies:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transparency in Prescription Drug Formularies:

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09SenateSee S2202

Same As/Similar To

S2202 (Replaced by) 2017-11-09 - Reprinted as amended, see S2211
H331 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1638 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H166 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H4112 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4113 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback