MA S2218 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2711
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to a residential PACE program. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to a residential PACE program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2711 |
2021-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S2537 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S427 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1739 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2014 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2708
S2711 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3276 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S2537 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S427 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1739 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2014 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2708
S2711 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3276 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2218 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2218.pdf |