MA S2216 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2189
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the registration of motor vehicle glass repair shops
Title
Requiring the registration of motor vehicle glass repair shops
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-07-26 | House | Enacted |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendments |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-25 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-18 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-05-09 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Amendment (Petruccelli) adopted |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for S2189 |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 12, 2012 |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ethics ad Rules |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S2189 |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2189 (Replaces) 2012-04-26 - New draft substituted, see S2216
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2216 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=116645&generalCourtId=1 |