MA S2211 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1175
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Further regulating tanning facilities
Title
Further regulating tanning facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-13 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-11 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, June 12, 2012 |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-04-09 | Senate | New draft of S1175 and H2372 |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1175 (Replaces) 2012-04-09 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2211
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2211 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=116470&generalCourtId=1 |