MA S2209 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1077
Note: Legislation replaced by S2328
Note: Legislation replaced by S2328
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the presence of dental hygienists on the board of registration in dentistry
Title
To increase the presence of dental hygienists on the board of registration in dentistry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-30 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2328 |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Read second |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2328 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2012-04-09 | Senate | New draft of S1077 and H605 |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1077 (Replaces) 2012-04-09 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2209
S2328 (Replaced by) 2013-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2012
S2328 (Replaced by) 2013-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2209 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=116464&generalCourtId=1 |