MA S2205 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to commemorate first landing day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Commemorating first landing day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-11-06 | House | House concurred |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H1650 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1713 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1714 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1700 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1653 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1713 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1714 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1700 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1653 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2205 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2205.pdf |