MA S219 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2518

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the town of Milton to issue a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Milton to issue a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-20SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2518
2023-04-10JointHearing scheduled for 04/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2518 (Replaced by) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2840 (Similar To) 2024-07-17 - Read third, amended by substitution of a new text (H4883) and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback