MA S2187 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1502
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing taxpayers a hearing at the Appellate Tax Board
Title
Providing taxpayers a hearing at the Appellate Tax Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-08-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-08-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-08-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-07-23 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-03-22 | Senate | New draft of S1502 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1502 (Replaces) 2011-09-07 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2187 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=116412&generalCourtId=1 |