MA S2185 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Margaret Poindexter, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Margaret Poindexter, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-24 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-17 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-17 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-06-09 | House | House concurred |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2185 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2185.pdf |