MA S2184 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1205
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating central service technicians
Title
Regulating central service technicians
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-10-19 | Senate | New draft of S1205 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1205 (Replaces) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2184
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2184 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2184.pdf |