MA S2163 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4280
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Cape Cod Water Protection Trust. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Establishing the Cape Cod Water Protection Trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4280 |
2017-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-09-21 | House | House concurred |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3902 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
H4280 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4280 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2163 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2163.pdf |