MA S2161 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the city of Westfield to convert a seasonal license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises to an annual license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the city of Westfield to convert a seasonal license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises to an annual license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2009 | |
2009-11-02 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2009-11-02 | Enacted | |
2009-10-29 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-10-08 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-07 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-09-30 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-09-29 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-09-29 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-29 | Substituted for S147 | |
2009-09-29 | Recommended new draft for S147 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S2161 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7790&generalCourtId=2 |