MA S2160 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2440
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the recording the assignment of mortgages. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to recording the assignment of mortgages
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2440 |
2012-06-27 | House | House concurred |
2012-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, July 13, 2012 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-04-09 | House | House concurred |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-29 | House | House concurred |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-12-19 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2440 (Replaced by) 2012-10-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2160 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17744&generalCourtId=1 |