MA S2142 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S2166

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Reprinted as amended, see S2166
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the hiring of persons with a disabilityā€¯ (Senate, No. 2142).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To relative to the hiring of persons with a disability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03SenateReprinted as amended, see S2166
2016-03-03SenateRead third (title changed)
2016-03-03SenateOrdered to a third reading
2016-03-03SenateSubstituted as a new draft for S86
2016-03-03SenateWays and Means amendment adopted, as amended
2016-03-03SenateAmendment #1 (L'Italien) adopted
2016-03-03SenateAmendment #6 (Tarr) adopted
2016-03-03SenateAmendment #5 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #245 [YEAS 5 - NAYS 30]
2016-03-03SenateAmendment #4 (L'Italien) adopted
2016-03-03SenateAmendment #3 (L'Italien) adopted
2016-02-25SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016
2016-02-25SenateRecommended new draft for S86
2016-02-25SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S2166 (Replaces) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S15 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2015
S16 (Similar To) 2015-03-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2015
S21 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - See H65
S36 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - See H3203
S39 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2015
S2513 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2515 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2517 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 402 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback