MA S2142 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 258 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bill Title: An Act to increase opportunities for long-term substance abuse recovery Tuesday, May 13, 2014 – Text of the Senate Bill to increase opportunities for long-term substance abuse recovery (being the text of Senate, No. 2133, printed as amended).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase opportunities for long-term substance abuse recovery

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-06SenateSigned by the Governor, Chapter 258 of the Acts of 2014
2014-08-01SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2014-08-01HouseEnacted
2014-08-01SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2014-08-01HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2014-07-31HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2014-07-31SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment, see S2341 -see Roll Call #464 [Yeas 40 - Nays 0]
2014-06-30HousePassed to be engrossed -149 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 412)
2014-06-30HouseFor text as amended by the House, see H4248
2014-06-30HouseAmendment 16 adopted
2014-06-30HouseAmendment 15 adopted
2014-06-30HouseAmendment 14 adopted
2014-06-30HouseAmendment 13 adopted, as changed
2014-06-30HouseAmendment 12 adopted, as changed
2014-06-30HouseAmendment 9 adopted
2014-06-30HouseAmendment 7 rejected
2014-06-30HouseAmendment 3 adopted
2014-06-30HouseAmendment 2 adopted
2014-06-30HouseRead third
2014-06-30HouseRules suspended
2014-06-30HouseOrdered to a third reading
2014-06-30HouseAmendment adopted, as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means, see H4236
2014-06-30HouseRead second
2014-06-30HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2014-06-30HouseReferred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2014-06-30HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4236
2014-05-15HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2014-05-15SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback