MA S2137 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-25 - Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: Senate Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-25 - Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: Senate Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the transfer of land in Marshfield. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the exchange of certain parcels of land in the town of Marshfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2012-07-24 | Senate | For message, see S2374 |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Governor returned to the Senate with veto |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-07-18 | House | Enacted |
2012-07-17 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-07-05 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-02 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-03-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2012-02-15 | House | House concurred |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2137 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17975&generalCourtId=1 |