MA S213 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the MassMade Program. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Establishing the MassMade Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Accompanied by H367 |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in The Gloucester House |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H367 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied S213
H367 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied S213
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S213 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S213.pdf |