MA S2126 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1609
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing governmental bodies to enter into contracts for the inspection, maintenance, repair or modification of water storage facilities
Title
Authorizing governmental bodies to enter into contracts for the inspection, maintenance, repair or modification of water storage facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-08-16 | House | Enacted |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-08-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-30 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2012-07-30 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4347 |
2012-05-07 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Postponed to May 3, 2012 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Read second |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 26, 2012 |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2012-02-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to Senate Committee on Ways and Means |
2012-02-06 | Senate | New draft of S1609 |
2012-02-06 | Senate | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1609 (Replaces) 2012-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2126
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2126 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17968&generalCourtId=1 |