MA S2125 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 244 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 244 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prescription drug diversion, abuse and addiction (being the text of Senate, No. 2122, printed as amended)
Title
Relative to prescription drug diversion, abuse and addiction
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 244 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-08-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid befor the Governor |
2012-08-09 | House | Enacted |
2012-08-09 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-08-09 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-08-09 | House | House concurred in the Senate further amendment |
2012-08-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-08-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment |
2012-08-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-31 | House | Amendment 3 adopted |
2012-07-31 | House | Amendment 1 adopted |
2012-07-31 | House | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2012-07-31 | House | Read third |
2012-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-30 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2012-07-30 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4346 |
2012-02-06 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #145 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Text of S2122, printed as amended |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2125 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17989&generalCourtId=1 |