MA S2115 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2719
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the electrification of new and substantially remodeled or rehabilitated building. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the electrification of new and substantially remodeled or rehabilitated building
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2719 |
2024-04-03 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-11 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-07-11 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1284 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - House concurred
S2217 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3139 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H3183 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4502 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2719 (Replaced by) 2024-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2217 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3139 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H3183 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4502 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2719 (Replaced by) 2024-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2115 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2115.pdf |