MA S2114 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the board of selectmen of Hardwick to appoint the town collector. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the board of selectmen of Hardwick to appoint the town collector

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2018
2018-03-09SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-03-06HouseEnacted
2018-03-05HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-02-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-02-07HouseRules suspended
2018-02-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-02-06HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-02-05SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-02-05SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2017-09-28SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-07-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-07-18JointHearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-07-17HouseHouse concurred
2017-07-13SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S2115 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback