MA S2114 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter of the town of Bourne. [Local Approval Received.] Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Bourne
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-06-05 | House | Enacted |
2012-06-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-04-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-03-07 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read second, amended (Murray), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-03-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/29/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2012-01-30 | House | House concurred |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2114 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17853&generalCourtId=1 |