MA S211 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the workforce competitiveness trust fund. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to the workforce competitiveness trust fund
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] | Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2215 |
2015-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Holyoke Community College |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S2215 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S224
S971 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
S169 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S855 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S1556 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1846 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S971 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
S169 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S855 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S1556 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1846 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S211 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S211.pdf |