MA S2103 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate June 29, 2017, – Text of the Senate Bill to prevent driver distraction and motor vehicle fatalities (being the text of Senate document number 2092, printed as amended)
Title
To prevent driver distraction and motor vehicle fatalities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-06-30 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Text of S2092, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S2058 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2092
H1892 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3660
H3444 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3660
S1962 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2058
H1892 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3660
H3444 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3660
S1962 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2058
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2103 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2103.pdf |