MA S2073 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an executive office of food resources and security. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing the Executive Office of Food Resources and Security
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2443 (Similar To) 2023-09-07 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2464 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - New draft substituted, see S2691
S2691 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2024
S2797 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2464 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - New draft substituted, see S2691
S2691 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2024
S2797 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2073 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2073.pdf |