MA S207 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2537
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure safer technology investment by the Massachusetts Broadband Institute. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Ensuring safer technology investment by the Massachusetts Broadband Institute
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2537 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S2537 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S207 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S207.pdf |