MA S2062 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to healthy youth (Senate, No. 2062) (being the text of Senate, No. 2048, printed as amended)
Title
Relative to healthy youth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #212 [YEAS 32 - NAYS 6] |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Text of S2048, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S2414 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S807 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S567 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1995 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S854 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S2048 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #212 [YEAS 32 - NAYS 6]
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S807 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S567 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1995 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S854 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S2048 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #212 [YEAS 32 - NAYS 6]
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2062 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2062.pdf |