MA S2049 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Bellingham to grant an additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Bellingham to grant an additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-12-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-12-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-12-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders |
2012-12-17 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Bill substituted for report and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-07-02 | House | House concurred |
2012-07-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 17, 2012 |
2012-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2012 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2012-04-19 | House | House concurred |
2012-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 3, 2012 |
2012-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-11-01 | House | House concurred |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2049 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17521&generalCourtId=1 |