MA S2042 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4591
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish and regulate resort-style entertainment in the Commonwealth
Title
Establishing and Regulating Resort-Style Entertainment in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4591 | |
2010-04-01 | Senate concurred | |
2010-03-31 | Reporting date extended to Friday, May 21, 2010 | |
2009-04-16 | House concurred | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4591 (Replaced by) 2010-04-14 - Published as amended, see H4619
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S2042 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=6479&generalCourtId=2 |