MA S2021 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act improving drinking water and wastewater infrastructure Text of the Senate Bill improving drinking water and wastewater infrastructure (being the text of Senate, No. 2016, printed as amended)
Title
Improving drinking water and wastewater infrastructure
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #492 [YEAS 40 - NAYS 0] |
2014-08-01 | House | Enacted 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 505) |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-08-01 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate further amendment |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment, see S2342 -see Roll Call #463 [Yeas 40 - Nays 0] |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed to be engrossed 146 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 404) |
2014-06-25 | House | Text of House amendment, see H4229 |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 26 adopted, as changed |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 27 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 24 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 15 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 42 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 35 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 17 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 29 rejected |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 39 rejected |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 38 rejected |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 37 rejected |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 11 rejected |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 33 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 5 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 3 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment 10 rejected |
2014-06-25 | House | Read third |
2014-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-06-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-23 | House | Amendment adopted, as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means, see H4212 |
2014-06-23 | House | Read second |
2014-06-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2014-06-23 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-06-23 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4212 |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -See Roll Call #262 [YEAS 37 to NAYS 0] |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Text of S2016, printed as amended |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2021 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2021.pdf |