MA S2020 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2184
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts Broadband Institute. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Broadband Institute
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2184 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-03-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/11/2014 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2014-02-26 | House | House concurred |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Telecommunications, Utilties and Energy |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2184 (Replaced by) 2014-07-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2020 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2020.pdf |