MA S2020 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1961
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Millbury to issue an additional liquor license reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2420).
Title
Authorizing the town of Millbury to grant an additional liquor license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-10-24 | House | Enacted |
2011-10-20 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-10-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-10-05 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Steering |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-09-22 | Senate | New draft of S1961 |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1961 (Replaces) 2012-12-06 - Accompanied S2020