MA S2011 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 9, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 9, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation relative to worker's compensation as it relates to employees who are members of the armed services or national guard
Title
For legislation relative to worker's compensation as it relates to employees who are members of the armed services or national guard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 9, 2010 | |
2010-04-05 | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 30, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 10/15 at 9:30 AM in VETERANS NORTHEAST OUTREACH CENTER HAVERHILL MA. 01830 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s02011.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st02/st02011.htm |