MA S2000 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Frank Silveira, and employee of the Department of Revenue. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Frank Silveira, an employee of the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2117 |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Read second |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2117 |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-08-18 | House | House concurred |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2117 (Replaced by) 2012-02-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2000 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16103&generalCourtId=1 |