MA S1992 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2439
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the surrender of firearms and ammunition to licensing authorities. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to surrender and storage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2439 |
2012-02-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-07-28 | House | House concurred |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-03-28 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2439 (Replaced by) 2012-09-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1992 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15072&generalCourtId=1 |