MA S1986 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to innovative communities (Senate, No. 1986) (being the text of Senate, No. 1982, printed as amended)
Title
Relative to innovative communities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-08-06 | House | Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -- see Roll Call #102 [Yeas 36-Nays 2] |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Text of S1982, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S1970 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1982
S1982 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #102 [Yeas 36-Nays 2]
S2424 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1846 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1847 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1982 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #102 [Yeas 36-Nays 2]
S2424 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1846 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1847 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1986 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1986.pdf |