MA S1985 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to designate a certain bridge in the town of Needham as the James J. Delaney II, UMSC Veterans Memorial Bridge. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a certain bridge in the town of Needham as the James J. Delaney II, UMSC Veterans Memorial Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2018
2018-04-04SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-04-04HouseEnacted
2018-04-02SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment
2018-04-02SenateRules suspended
2018-01-29HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2017-12-21HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-12-21HouseRules suspended
2017-12-21HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-12-18HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-12-14SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2017-12-14SenateRules suspended
2017-12-14SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-10-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2017-10-05SenateAccompanied by H3425
2017-03-31JointHearing scheduled for 04/12/2017 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H1809 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2017
H3425 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Accompanied S1985
H3684 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4157
H3849 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2018
H3900 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2017
H3960 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2017
H4031 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2018
H4072 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2018
H4156 (Similar To) 2018-03-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2018
H4023 (Similar To) 2018-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback