MA S1981 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2277
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the composition of the board of directors of the Massachusetts Department of Transporation. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the composition of the MassDOT board of directors
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Rep. Edward Coppinger [D] | Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2277 |
2017-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S687 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H3001 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2578 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1814 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2277 (Replaced by) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3001 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2578 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1814 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2277 (Replaced by) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1981 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1981.pdf |