MA S1976 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2014
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - New draft substituted, see S2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - New draft substituted, see S2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a sick leave bank for Steven Thomas, an employee of the Department of Correction
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Steven Thomas, an employee of the Department of Correction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-15 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2014 |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Read second |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2014 |
2011-08-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-07-25 | House | House concurred |
2011-07-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-07-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2014 (Replaced by) 2011-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2011
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1976 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17047&generalCourtId=1 |