MA S1967 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge in the town of Andover as the Andover Veterans of the Iraqi and Afghanistan War Memorial Bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the town of Andover as the Andover Veterans of the Iraq and Afghanistan Wars Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-04-14 | House | Enacted |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-04-08 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/12/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-01-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/05/2014 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-12-26 | House | House concurred |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Transportation |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1967 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1967.pdf |