MA S1965 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3711
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce prescription drug tampering and abuse. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
To reduce prescription drug tampering and abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | New draft substituted as amended, see S2133 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, May 13, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, see S2133 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Accompanied by H3711 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, see S2100 and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Senate Committee on Health Care Financing |
2014-02-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/04/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-12-26 | House | House concurred |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-12-02 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3711 (Replaces) 2014-05-08 - Accompanied S1965
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1965 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1965.pdf |