MA S1963 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2435
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote transparency of facial recognition and driver's license photos. Transportation.
Title
To promote transparency of facial recognition and driver's license photos
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2435 |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 1:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2001 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1930 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H2099 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1919 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H2719 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2435 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1930 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H2099 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1919 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H2719 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2435 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1963 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1963.pdf |