MA S1963 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate June fourteenth as the birthday of the United States Army and June ninth as General Sylvanus Thayer Day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating June 14 as the birthday of the United States Army and June 9 as General Sylvanus Thayer Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Enacted |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-29 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-05-28 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-04-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-02-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/26/2014 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-12-19 | House | House concurred |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1963 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1963.pdf |