MA S1935 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a net zero stretch energy code. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a net zero stretch energy code

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1829 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1987 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2841 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3666 (Similar To) 2019-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2874 (Similar To) 2019-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback