MA S1915 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Kingston to install, finance and operate wind energy facilities. [Local Approval Received.] Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the town of Kingston to install, finance and operate wind energy facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-04-09 | House | Enacted |
2012-04-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-03-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-02-06 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-01-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2011-04-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1915 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15154&generalCourtId=1 |