MA S1895 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to increase in the exemption for residential real property in the city of Malden from 20 per cent to 30 per cent. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To increase in the exemption for residential real property in the city of Malden from 20 per cent to 30 per cent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-10-11 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-10-11 | House | Enacted |
2011-10-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-10-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-09-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2011 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-04-19 | House | House concurred |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1895 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15309&generalCourtId=1 |