MA S1886 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2498
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to meeting the energy needs of the Commonwealth. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to meeting the energy needs of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2498 |
2017-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1756 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
S1510 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1698 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1471 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1829 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1746 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H906 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1483 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2417 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1729 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3955 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Placed on file, in concurrence
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H4092 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2244 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - See H4045
S2302 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - See S2545
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
S1510 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1698 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1471 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1829 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1746 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H906 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1483 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2417 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1729 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3955 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Placed on file, in concurrence
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H4092 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2244 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - See H4045
S2302 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - See S2545
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1886 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1886.pdf |