MA S1875 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain road in the city of Salem as the Sgt. James Ayube Memorial Drive Transportation. [Local Approval Received]
Title
Designating the new Bridge Street Bypass Road in Salem as the "Sgt. James Ayube Memorial Drive"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2011 |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-05-26 | House | Enacted |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-05-26 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-05-26 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-05-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-05-23 | House | Committee reported that the mater be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2012-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-03-09 | House | House concurred |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rule 20 and Joint Rule 12 suspended |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1875 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15035&generalCourtId=1 |