MA S1870 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2446
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance the Global Warming Solutions Act. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Enhancing the Global Warming Solutions Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Knapik [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Rep. Steven Levy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2446 |
2012-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Weymouth Town Hall |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. |
2011-01-20 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2446 (Replaced by) 2012-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1870 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12256&generalCourtId=1 |